SCUTELLA v. CITY OF ERIE BUREAU OF POLICE et al
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Defendant: ERIE COUNTY POLICE FORCE, ALL OFFICERS INVOLVED IN MY ARREST/CASE, MATTHEW EICHER and ERIE POLICE STATION
Case Number: 1:2011cv00198
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Presiding Judge: Maurice B. Cohill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 7/6/15. (bfm)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 111 Motion to Compel Production of Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 6/8/15. (bfm)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 107 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 2/20/15. (bfm )
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion for Discovery. It is GRANTED as follows: the discovery period is reopened until January 30, 2015 for the following limited purposes: (1)supplementing the interrogatory requests previously serve d on the individual Defendants; (2)obtaining documents and witnesses relatedto medical treatment obtained by Plaintiff; (3)obtaining documents relating to the City of Erie Bureau of Police Policies or Procedures for the proper usage of a taser; and ( 4) obtaining a copy of the booking report from the City of Erie Bureau of Police. Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED, in the interest of time and convenience of all the parties, to the extent that Plaintiff seeks to depose the Defendants. It is FURTHER ORDE RED that the jury trial in this matter shall be continued until the Erie May 2015 trial term, which begins on May 4, 2015. An Amended Final Scheduling Order setting forth a new jury trial date, as well as other relevant dates, will issue FORTHWITH. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 12/23/14. (bfm)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement and denying without prejudice 96 Defendant's Motion in Limine. For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum, the Court finds that it is i n the interests of justice to continue the jury trial in this matter until the Erie March 2015 trial term, which begins on March 2, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the pretrial statement filed by Plaintiff pro se on November 17, 2014 shall be stricken from the Record. An Amended Final Scheduling Order setting forth a new jury trial date, as well as other relevant dates, will issue FORTHWITH. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 12-9-14. (bfm )
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 91 Motion. Exhibits V-1 and V-2 will be made available to Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 11/20/14. (bfm )
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITY OF ERIE BUREAU OF POLICE, MICHAEL BROWN, WILLIAM GOOZDICH, MATTHEW EICHER, NOBLE, JAMES COUSINS, and JERRY STEVENS. It is ORD ERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 85 , dated August 29,2014, as supplemented by this Memorandum Order, is adopted as the Opinion of the Court. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 73 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENED IN PART, as follows: 1. Defendants' motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs Section 1983 municipal liability Claim against Defendant City of Erie Bureau of Police and sai d Defendant shall be terminated from this case; and 2. Defendants' motion is denied in all other respects.It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that a case management conference shall be held on November 6, 2014 at 2:30 P.M. in the chambers of the Honorable Maurice B. Cohill, Jr., U.S. Courthouse, Room A-240, 17 South Park Row, Erie, Pennsylvania, 16501. All parties shall be prepared to discuss settlement. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 10/22/14. (bfm )
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 79 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by JHEN SCUTELLA. It is hereby ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Baxter 83 , dated July 2, 2014, is adopted as the Opinion of the Court. It is further hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Jhen Scutella's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 79 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 7/28/14. (bfm )
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM ORDER that the 30 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Baxter dated 4/20/2012 is adopted as the Opinion of the Court except as modified. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's mal icious prosecution claim and his excessive force claim to the extent it is premised on the 8th Amendment and the 14th Amendment is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE. Leave to amend is denied as futile; that 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff 9;s 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 municipal liability claim against Defendant City of Erie Bureau of Police is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall be permitted until 6/15/2012 to file a Second Amended Complaint that sufficiently alleges facts to sup port a municipal liability claim against Defendant City of Erie Bureau of Police; that Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 4th Amendment excessive use of force claim, his conspiracy claim, and his inadequate medical care claim to the extent it is premised upon the Due Process clause of the 14th Amendment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 5/15/2012. (sjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCUTELLA v. CITY OF ERIE BUREAU OF POLICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE COUNTY POLICE FORCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OFFICERS INVOLVED IN MY ARREST/CASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW EICHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE POLICE STATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?