SCUTELLA v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00165
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that Defendants motion to dismiss 30 be GRANTED. The Clerk of Courts should be directed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/17/14. (lrw)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that Defendants motion to dismiss 19 be dismissed.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a Second Amended Complaint before January 21, 2013. Plaintiff must fully set forth the constitutional challenges to the spec ific statute/s and must fully identify the relief he seeks from this Court. No further amendment of the complaint will be permitted. Plaintiffs failure to file a Second Amended Complaint by January 21, 2013, may result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/31/13. (lrw)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Defendants motion to dismiss 11 be DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an amended complaint challenging the constitutionality of the criminal statute before May 24, 2013. Failure to file the amended complaint in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/24/13. (lrw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCUTELLA v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?