BROWN v. FOX et al
Plaintiff: LAMAR BROWN
Defendant: FOX, MORENDO, JOHN DOE, OBRIEN, DUNMIRE, STREICHART and JOHN DOE 2
Case Number: 1:2014cv00109
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration 118 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for status conference 125 is GRANTED. A status conference will be set by separate Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/7/19. (lrw)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DUNMIRE, FOX, STREICHART, OBRIEN, MORENDO. Order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/12/17. (lrw)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that Defendants motion to dismiss 8 is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for default judgment 14 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed amended complaint 12 is deeme d filed. In response to the amended complaint, Defendants may file an answer or motion to dismiss before April 3, 2015. Defendants should take care to address all the allegations of the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/17/2015. (lrw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. FOX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAMAR BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX
Represented By: Sandra A. Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORENDO
Represented By: Sandra A. Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OBRIEN
Represented By: Sandra A. Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNMIRE
Represented By: Sandra A. Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STREICHART
Represented By: Sandra A. Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?