KLOSS v. SCI ALBION/PA D.O.C. et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL A. KLOSS
Defendant: SCI ALBION/PA D.O.C., NANCY GIROUX, CHRISTINE ZIRKLE, VALERIE KUZIAK, ROBERT MAXA, KURT SUESSER, WAGNER and SANTOS
Case Number: 1:2015cv00282
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting 287 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 293 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendation 301 . For the reasons set forth in the Report and Recommendation 301 , which is hereby adopted as the final order of the Court, the Motion to Dismiss filed by the Corrections Defendants 287 is GRANTED as to Defendants Giroux, Zirkle, Wetzel, McHenry, Seelinger, Fait, Jones, Dube, Meure, and McLaurin, each of whom is dismissed from this action, with prejudice. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant MacAraw 293 is GRANTED, and Defendant MacAraw is dismissed from this action, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/25/18. (jdg)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER adopting 262 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and denying 247 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 12/4/2017. (jds)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER adopting 232 Report and Recommendation and denying 207 Motion for Hearing 210 MOTION to Change Venue and 227 MOTION for Hearing filed by DANIEL A. KLOSS. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 8/14/2017. (jds)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER adopting 195 Report and Recommendation and denying 135 136 146 158 162 165 174 179 Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 6/28/2017. (jds)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER adopting 148 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Wagner and Santos are dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 6/7/2017. (jds)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ADOPTING 120 Report and Recommendations. The Court hereby DENIES 108 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and 109 Motion for Pain Medication. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 2/13/2017. (jds)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting Report and Recommendations re 85 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 9/9/2016. (nk)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation and denying Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunction [Dkt. Nos. 10, 42, 44, 49, 50, 51, 53, 55, and 58].. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 7/12/16. (Rothstein, Barbara)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLOSS v. SCI ALBION/PA D.O.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL A. KLOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI ALBION/PA D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY GIROUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE ZIRKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERIE KUZIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MAXA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT SUESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?