ANGLE v. CARTER et al
Plaintiff: BRYAN ANGLE, II
Defendant: CARTER, DAVIS, STEED, JOHN DOE, PERRY and SNYDER
Case Number: 1:2016cv00276
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Forest
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction and/or temporary restraining order, ECF No. 68 , is DENIED. The report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lanzillo, entered orally on the record on April 18, 2019, ECF No. 72 , is adopted as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/17/19. (lrw)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by BRYAN ANGLE, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on March 22, 2019. (jbh)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 45 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: the motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Davis, and the motion isDENIED with respect to Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment failure to protect claim against Defendant Steed. The report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lanzillo, issued on February 1, 2019, ECF No. 58 , is adopted as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/28/19. (lrw)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations that Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction/T.R.O., ECF No. 53 , is DENIED. The report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lanzillo, issued on November 15, 2018, ECF No. 56 , is adopted as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/2/19. (lrw)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/14/2018. (dm)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER indicating that the Defendants' motion to dismiss 29 is granted as to the claims asserted against Defendants Captain Carter and U.M. Perry and denied in all other respects; that the Clerk of Court shall terminate Defendants Carter and Perry as parties to this case; that the 12/15/17 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Baxter 34 is adopted as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/8/18. (jg)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order 11 is denied, and the transcribed Report and Recommendation 14 15 of Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter is adopted as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/13/17. (jg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANGLE v. CARTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN ANGLE, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?