PAYNE v. WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Petitioner: HARDING LEE PAYNE
Respondent: WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Case Number: 1:2018cv00239
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5,receipt #2466852153 ), filed by HARDING LEE PAYNE. (jd) Modified on 9/24/2018. (jd)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Habeas Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 2466852153 (jd)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The petitioner may reopen the case if, by September 28, 2018, he pays the $5.00 filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by the documents outlined above. Failure to comply with this order shall be construed as indicating the petitioner's decision not to continue prosecution of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/29/18. (jpe)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 Remark: Petition for Habeas Corpus received, no IFP, no filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYNE v. WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HARDING LEE PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?