COOK v. FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Petitioner: THEODORE COOK
Respondent: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Case Number: 1:2018cv00257
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that this case is CLOSED. The petitioner may reopen it if he pays the $5.00 filing fee or files a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/26/18. (jpe) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/26/2018) (jpe).
September 21, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter no longer assigned to the case. (jgb)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 Remark: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus received. No filing fee paid, no Motion to Proceed IFP filed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of 2241, #2 Envelope Documents mailed in) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THEODORE COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?