OLSEN et al v. J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC
Plaintiff: SHERREE OLSEN and CHASE OLSEN
Defendant: J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00292
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Gregory Donald Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/20/2018. (fcf)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for George Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/20/2018. (fcf)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for attorney George Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4936519) by CHASE OLSEN, SHERREE OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of GMF, #2 GMF Certificate of Good Standings, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fleming, George)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Gregory Donald Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4932347) by CHASE OLSEN, SHERREE OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Brown, Gregory)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandy S. Ringer on behalf of J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC. (Ringer, Brandy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Williams on behalf of J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC. (Williams, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHASE OLSEN, SHERREE OLSEN. J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC waiver sent on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Riley, Steven)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC (jd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CHASE OLSEN, SHERREE OLSEN (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Riley, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/27/18. (lrw)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4876423), filed by CHASE OLSEN, SHERREE OLSEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLSEN et al v. J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERREE OLSEN
Represented By: Steven E. Riley, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Fleming
Represented By: Gregory D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE OLSEN
Represented By: Steven E. Riley, Jr.
Represented By: George M. Fleming
Represented By: Gregory D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W. DIDADO ELECTRIC, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Williams
Represented By: Brandy S. Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?