SNAIR et al v. SPEEDWAY LLC

Plaintiff: JAMIE L. SNAIR and MONTY ALLEN SNAIR
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00333
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Mediation article. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/14/18. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Article) (lrw)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 1/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Room A-280, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Erie, PA before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 12/27/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/31/2018. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/14/18. (lrw)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: 12(b) motions. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/14/18. (lrw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Sember Izsak, Rebecca)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Marathon Petroleum Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Sember Izsak, Rebecca)
October 26, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/2/2018. (jv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Vanango County, case number 1032-2018 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4909365), filed by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Including Complaint, #3 Exhibit B) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNAIR et al v. SPEEDWAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE L. SNAIR
Represented By: Richard G. Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTY ALLEN SNAIR
Represented By: Richard G. Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Sember Izsak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?