WOOTEN v. WARDEN
Defendant: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Petitioner: ROBERT WOOTEN
Case Number: 1:2018cv00334
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WARDEN. (Fischer, Adam)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Fischer on behalf of WARDEN. (Fischer, Adam)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the Respondent, the United States Attorney General, and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Service shall be by certified mail. All costs to be advanced by the United States. Within 60 days of service of this Order, the Respondent and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania shall file an Answer to the allegations of the petition. The parties are allowed 14 days from this date to appeal this order to a District Judge pursuant to Local Rule 72(C)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/26/2018. (dm)
November 26, 2018 Service copies placed in US Marshal box. (dm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 14668003885), filed by ROBERT WOOTEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Habeas Corpus Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14668003885 (sdp)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that this case is administratively closed. Petitioner may reopen it if, by 11/29/18, he pays the $5.00 filing fee or files a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/29/18. (jpe)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 Remark: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Lodged due to no filing fee received and no Motion to proceed IFP Received. (Attachment(s): #1 Envelope) (jv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOOTEN v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Represented By: Adam Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?