ENCAPERA v. ENCAPERA et al
Plaintiff: DANA R. ENCAPERA
Defendant: ANDERSON, BOROUGH OF CALIFORNIA, PA, RICHARD ENCAPERA, CS PAROLE, WILLIAM PEARCE, KIMBERLY SITTIG, SULLIVAN, DR. LEARN, ADMINISTRATION @ SCI CAMBRIDGE SPRINGS MEDICAL, COUNTIES OF WASHINGTON (COURTS), SCI CAMBRIDGE SPRINGS (ADMINISTRATION), NATHAN PETERS, COUNTIES OF FAYETTE (COURTS), JOSHUA KANALIS, FNU STALEY, SR., STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, PATTY JO MISCHKO and FNU STALEY, JR.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00387
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RICHARD ENCAPERA, WILLIAM PEARCE, NATHAN PETERS, JOSHUA KANALIS, FNU STALEY, SR, FNU STALEY, JR, filed by DANA R. ENCAPERA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Amended Complaint mailed in) (ksa) Modified text on 2/5/2019. (ksa)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a proposed complaint. Although Plaintiff's complaint identifies several defendants, she fails to set forth any factual averments of any sort. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff file an amended complaint on or before January 30, 2019. If Plaintiff fails, within the applicable time period, to file an amended complaint adhering to the standards set forth, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 1/16/2019. (dm)
January 16, 2019 Amended Complaint due by 1/30/2019 (dm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DANA R. ENCAPERA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Document mailed in) (ksa)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 It is hereby ORDERED this 7th day of January, 2019, that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #3 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may reopen the case by (i) tendering to the "Clerk, U.S. District Court," a statutory filing fee in the amount of $350.00, plus an administrative filing fee in the amount of $50.00, for a total of $400.00 or (ii) submitting another motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required affidavit and a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 1/7/2019. (dm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DANA R. ENCAPERA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM & ORDER the Complaint filed by Dana R. Encapera has been received without a filing fee or the forms required to proceed in forma pauperis in a civil rights case. This action may not proceed unless the Plaintiff either (1) tenders to the "Clerk, U.S. District Court" the statutory filing fee in the amount of $350.00, plus a $50.00 administrative fee, for a total of $400.00 or (2) files a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED this 18th day of December, 2018, that the Clerk of Court is to mark this case administratively CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/18/2018. (dm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged. No filing fee paid, no Motion to Proceed IFP filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Complaint mailed in) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENCAPERA v. ENCAPERA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF CALIFORNIA, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ENCAPERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS PAROLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PEARCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY SITTIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEARN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATION @ SCI CAMBRIDGE SPRINGS MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTIES OF WASHINGTON (COURTS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI CAMBRIDGE SPRINGS (ADMINISTRATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTIES OF FAYETTE (COURTS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA KANALIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU STALEY, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATTY JO MISCHKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU STALEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA R. ENCAPERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?