ISADORE v. BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT

Plaintiff: DANNY ISADORE
Defendant: BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT
Case Number: 1:2018cv00398
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin M. Romano on behalf of BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT. (Romano, Karin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. McGinnis on behalf of BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT. (McGinnis, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DANNY ISADORE. BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Karpf, Ari)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael McAuliffe Miller on behalf of BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT. (Miller, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee C. Mattei Myers on behalf of BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT. (Myers, Renee)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/10/19. (lrw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M. Cerutti on behalf of DANNY ISADORE. (Cerutti, Jeremy)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT. (ksa)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4977578), filed by DANNY ISADORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Borough of Smethport) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISADORE v. BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF SMETHPORT
Represented By: Thomas P. McGinnis
Represented By: Renee C. Mattei Myers
Represented By: Karin M. Romano
Represented By: Michael McAuliffe Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY ISADORE
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: Jeremy M. Cerutti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?