EYAJAN v. NESCO RESOURCE LLC et al
Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE EYAJAN
Defendant: BILL KAYDO, RANDY EDWARDS, COMMUNITY HEALTH NET, DR. DAVID A. BOWE, IC YOUNGSTOWN DISTRICT OFFICE, DR. JAY MORITZ, DR. ERIC MILIE, KELLY STODDARD, CLEVELAND CLINIC ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY, AMY FARRIS, KIM GLADDEN, WALTER M VIEWEG, DR. JEFFERY MANWAY, DR CHRISTINE CHANDLER, DR. XIAN WEN JIN, ASHTABULA SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, DR. ZAHIDA BHATTI, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH PHYSICIANS, NATHANIEL FRANLEY, MD, ERICA MEDLEY, NESCO RESOURCE LLC, KIM S. GLADDEN, MD, KIM KOSKI, UPMC HAMOT ER STAFF ET AL. UNKOWN, DR. FRANK SAILORS, DR. MIKE JUNEVOCH, WEST ERIE MEDICAL GROUP UPMC HAMOT, PLASTPRO, LYNN MUNN, CLEVELAND CLINIC INTERNAL MEDICINE, DR. WALTER VIEWEG, MILLCREEK HOSPITAL, UPMC HAMOT-FOOT AND ANKLE CENTER, 1-888 OHIOCOMP, CLEVELAND CLINIC MADISON and BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00034
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case. Defendants' response due by 1/17/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 01/03/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Reopen Case by SHEILA MARIE EYAJAN. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (cjo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against 1-888 OHIOCOMP, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ASHTABULA SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, ZAHIDA BHATTI, DAVID A. BOWE, BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, CHRISTINE CHANDLER, CLEVELAND CLINIC INTERNAL MEDICINE, CLEVELAND CLINIC MADISON, CLEVELAND CLINIC ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY, COMMUNITY HEALTH NET, RANDY EDWARDS, AMY FARRIS, NATHANIEL FRANLEY, MD, KIM S. GLADDEN, MD, KIM GLADDEN, IC YOUNGSTOWN DISTRICT OFFICE, XIAN WEN JIN, MIKE JUNEVOCH, BILL KAYDO, KIM KOSKI(at 3904 Ninevah Road), KIM KOSKI(at 2241 Walnut Blvd), JEFFERY MANWAY, ERICA MEDLEY, ERIC MILIE, MILLCREEK HOSPITAL, JAY MORITZ, LYNN MUNN, NESCO RESOURCE LLC, PLASTPRO, FRANK SAILORS, KELLY STODDARD, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH PHYSICIANS, UPMC HAMOT ER STAFF ET AL. UNKOWN, UPMC HAMOT-FOOT AND ANKLE CENTER, WALTER VIEWEG, WALTER M VIEWEG, WEST ERIE MEDICAL GROUP UPMC HAMOT, filed by SHEILA MARIE EYAJAN. (jv)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED; and Plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED as untimely pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(1) of the Prison Litigation Reform Act.The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/3/19. (lrw)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION that #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHEILA MARIE EYAJAN will be granted, and Plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed as untimely. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/3/19. (lrw)
February 12, 2019 Remark: USM 285 forms received for the following : DR. XIAM WEN JIN, IC YOUNGSTOWN DISTRICT OFFICE, NESCO RESOURCE LLC, BUREAU OF WORKERS COMPENSATION, ASHTABULA SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, BILL KAYDO, KIM KOSKI (2),1-888-OHIO-COMP C/O ERICA METLEY, 1-888-OHIO-COMP C/O LYNN MUNN, LAKE HEALTH SOUTH TYLER BLVD C/O DR. DAVID BOWE, LAKE HEALTH SOUTH TYLER BLVD C/O DR. WALTER VIEWEG, WALTER M. VIEWEG, WEST ERIE MEDICAL GROUP PMC HAMOT C/O CR CHRISTINE CHANDLER, UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH PHYSICIANS C/O DR MANWAY UPMC FOOD AND ANKLE CENTER C/O DR MORITZ, UPMC HAMOT STAFF UNKNOWN, CLEVELAND CLINIC MADISON C/O FRANK SALLORS, CLEVELAND CLINIC ORGHOREDIC SURGERY C/O KIM GLADDAN, KIM GLADDEN MD, ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER C/O NATHANIEL FRAMLEY, NATHANIEL FRAMLEY MD, MILLCREEK HOSPITAL C/O RANDY EDWARDS, MILLCREEK HOSPITAL C/O AMY FARRIS, DR. ERIC MILIE, COMMUNITY HEALTH NET C/O DR ZAHIDA BHATTI, COMMUNITY HEALTH NET C/O KELLY STODDARD, DR. MIKE JUNEVOCH (jd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SHEILA MARIE EYAJAN. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EYAJAN v. NESCO RESOURCE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL KAYDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY HEALTH NET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. DAVID A. BOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IC YOUNGSTOWN DISTRICT OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JAY MORITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. ERIC MILIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY STODDARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEVELAND CLINIC ORTHOPEDIC SURGERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY FARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM GLADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER M VIEWEG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JEFFERY MANWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR CHRISTINE CHANDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. XIAN WEN JIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHTABULA SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHTABULA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. ZAHIDA BHATTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH PHYSICIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHANIEL FRANLEY, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICA MEDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NESCO RESOURCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM S. GLADDEN, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM KOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC HAMOT ER STAFF ET AL. UNKOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. FRANK SAILORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MIKE JUNEVOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST ERIE MEDICAL GROUP UPMC HAMOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLASTPRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN MUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEVELAND CLINIC INTERNAL MEDICINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. WALTER VIEWEG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLCREEK HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC HAMOT-FOOT AND ANKLE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-888 OHIOCOMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEVELAND CLINIC MADISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE EYAJAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?