COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA v. TEJADA
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant: RICKY TEJADA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER adopting #2 Report and Recommendation. This case is remanded to the Erie County Court of Common Pleas. The Clerk is directed to mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/09/19. (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by RICKY TEJADA. It is respectfully recommended that this matter be remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Erie County pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1455(b)(4). Objections to R&R due by 6/21/2019 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/7/2019. (dm)
June 7, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (dm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Erie County, case number 2407cr2015, filed by RICKY TEJADA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA v. TEJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY TEJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?