KNEPP v. PARAWAY et al

Plaintiff: JAMES T. KNEPP
Defendant: WARDEN MICHAEL R. CLARK, NURSE PARAWAY, DR. A. HARTWELL, MS. JERI SMOCK, MS. ROBIN MILLER, MIKE EDWARDS, ROBIN MILLER, ROMONA PARAWAY and MICHAEL R. CLARK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00153
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 27 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JAMES T. KNEPP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (av)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting #9 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff James Knepp's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/11/19. (esa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL R. CLARK, MIKE EDWARDS, A. HARTWELL, ROBIN MILLER, ROMONA PARAWAY, JERI SMOCK by A. HARTWELL. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Malloy, Devon) Modified text on 7/12/2019 to change title of event. (av)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel H. Foreman on behalf of A. HARTWELL. (Foreman, Samuel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Devon A. Malloy on behalf of A. HARTWELL. (Malloy, Devon)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 7/9/2019. (dm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL R. CLARK, MIKE EDWARDS, A. HARTWELL, ROBIN MILLER, ROMONA PARAWAY, JERI SMOCK, filed by JAMES T. KNEPP. (av)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Amended Complaint #4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Relief of Extraordinary Circumstances by JAMES T. KNEPP. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (av)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support of #4 Amended Complaint filed by JAMES T. KNEPP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (av)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JAMES T. KNEPP. (jv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support re #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by JAMES T. KNEPP. (jv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JAMES T. KNEPP. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JAMES T. KNEPP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JAMES T. KNEPP. (jv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Motion for TRO held on June 19, 2019 before Judge Richard Lanzillo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janis Ferguson, Telephone number 8144649613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 6/28/2019. Redaction Request due 7/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2019. (jlf)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES T. KNEPP. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Statement, #2 Envelope) (jv)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JAMES T. KNEPP. It is respectfully recommended that Plaintiff James Knepp's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order [ECF No. 5] be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2019 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 7/8/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/20/2019. (dm)
June 20, 2019 Case reassigned to Presiding Judge Susan Paradise Baxter and referred to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Motions referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (sdp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo: Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2019 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JAMES T. KNEPP. Discussion with Plaintiff and Defense counsel re Plaintiffs medical history and treatment. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) (dm) #1 UPMC Hamot Medical Records (dm) Modified text on 6/20/2019. (dm)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting telephonic hearing on #5 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO for June 19, 2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Counsel for the Defendants, specially appearing, is instructed to call into chambers at 814-464-9610 with Plaintiff on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on June 14, 2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (zsb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion for TRO filed by JAMES T. KNEPP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JAMES T. KNEPP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Proposed Order to show cause, #3 Envelope) (jv)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 REMARK: AMENDED COMPLAINT received against MICHAEL R. CLARK, MIKE EDWARDS, A. HARTWELL, ROBIN MILLER, PARAWAY, JERI SMOCK, filed by JAMES T. KNEPP. (jv)
June 11, 2019 USM-285'S RECEIVED for Mike Edwards (sdp)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case administratively closed, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may reopen the case by (i) tendering to the "Clerk, U.S. District Court," a statutory filing fee in the amount of $350.00, plus an administrative filing fee in the amount of $50.00, for a total of $400.00 or (ii) submitting another motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required affidavit and a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint #2 . Plaintiff is instructed that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), a party is entitled to amend his pleading once as a matter of course within 21 days after serving it. Accordingly, Plaintiff does not need to request leave from the Court to file an Amended Complaint, and his motion will be DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/7/2019. (dm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by JAMES T. KNEPP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope Motion mailed in) (ksa)
May 28, 2019 USM285s received. (dm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES T. KNEPP. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Authorization by prisoner, #4 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge, #5 Envelope) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNEPP v. PARAWAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN MICHAEL R. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE PARAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. A. HARTWELL
Represented By: Devon A. Malloy
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. JERI SMOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. ROBIN MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMONA PARAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES T. KNEPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?