SCUTELLA v. ERIE COUNTY PRISON et al
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN BRYANT, ERIE COUNTY PRISON, AMBER CHAFFE and MICHEAL HOLMAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00168
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (nll)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Objections filed by JHEN SCUTELLA. Plaintiff averment that he has no funds in his prison account is contradicted by the exhibits attached to his in forma pauperis application. To the extent that Plaintiff believes those exhibits are inaccurate, the Court will permit Plaintiff an opportunity to provide an updated institutional account statement demonstrating his lack of funds. Otherwise, Plaintiff must proceed with this action by tendering the full filing fee to the Clerk of Courts, as instructed in the Court's order of June 12, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 7/16/2019. (dm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS to #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nll)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope motion mailed in) (ksa)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must tender to the "Clerk, U.S. District Court" the statutory filing fee in the amount of $350.00, plus a $50.00 administrative fee, for a total of $400.00. Failure to do so on or before July 12, 2019, may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/12/2019. (dm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope Documents mailed in) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCUTELLA v. ERIE COUNTY PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER CHAFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEAL HOLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?