SCOTT v. CLARK et al

Plaintiff: JOSEPH D. SCOTT
Defendant: G. McINTOSH, CCPM MICHAEL R. CLARK and OFFICER S. ARNOLD
Case Number: 1:2019cv00169
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Plaintiff failed to submit a certified institutional account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the Complaint. Plaintiff is reminded that this is a statutory requirement pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Accordingly, this action will remain closed until such time as Plaintiff submits a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to seek guidance from the appropriate official at his institution as to how to obtain the requisite statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 7/8/2019. (dm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH D. SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope) (jd)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case administratively closed, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/12/2019. (dm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH D. SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT LODGED PENDING IFP MOTION, #2 DOCUMENT, #3 Envelope) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. CLARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH D. SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. McINTOSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCPM MICHAEL R. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER S. ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?