LOPER v. FEDERAL TAX, FEDERAL TAX RETURN
Plaintiff: MATT L. LOPER
Defendant: FEDERAL TAX, FEDERAL TAX RETURN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00200
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL TAX, FEDERAL TAX RETURN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number IFP Granted), filed by MATT L. LOPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [l] is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint be dismissed with prejudice as legally frivolous in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lanzillo, issued on July 26, 2019 #3 is adopted as the opinion of the court. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close this case. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue his claims any further, he must do so by filing a Motion for Leave to Amend, accompanied by a proposed Amended Complaint, before September 27, 2019. Should Plaintiff fail to do so, this dismissal will automatically be converted to a final dismissal as of that date without further Order or Notice from this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 08/22/19. (esa)
July 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (dm)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MATT L. LOPER. It is hereby recommended that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 1] be GRANTED. The Clerk should be ordered to docket the Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2019; Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 7/26/2019. (dm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MATT L. LOPER. (cel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MATT L. LOPER. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Statement, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope, #5 Exhibit) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOPER v. FEDERAL TAX, FEDERAL TAX RETURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL TAX, FEDERAL TAX RETURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT L. LOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?