DELGADO v. FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Petitioner: JUAN DELGADO
Respondent: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00225
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JUAN DELGADO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Returned Executed by JUAN DELGADO. FCI MCKEAN WARDEN served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (jm)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 10/9/2019, the PETITIONER shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form will be provided to Petitioner with this Order. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/25/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FCI MCKEAN WARDEN. (Fischer, Adam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Fischer on behalf of FCI MCKEAN WARDEN. (Fischer, Adam)
September 5, 2019 Service copies placed in US Marshal box. (dm)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail, costs to be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/4/2019. (dm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 14668004279), filed by JUAN DELGADO. (elt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Fee Paid by JUAN DELGADO. Fee $5.00, receipt number 14668004279. (elt) Modified text on 8/29/2019. (elt)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: HABEAS PETITION Lodged pending disposition of Case, NO IFP, NO FILING FEE received. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELGADO v. FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Represented By: Adam Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUAN DELGADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?