VELAZQUEZ v. FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Petitioner: MIGUEL VERDUZCO VELAZQUEZ
Respondent: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00226
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Writ of Habeas Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14668004318 (elt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER This case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Petitioner may reopen this case if, by September 30, 2019, he: (a) pays the $5.00 filing fee; or, (b) files a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis along with the following two documents: (i) a certificate from the warden or other appropriate officer of FCI McKean showing the amount of money or securities that he has in any account in the institution; and, (ii) a certified copy of his institutional account statement from every jail or prison at which he was confined for the 6-month period leading up to the date the account statement is submitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 8/30/2019. (dm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged without prepayment of filing fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VELAZQUEZ v. FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI MCKEAN WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MIGUEL VERDUZCO VELAZQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?