RAUTERKUS et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: MARIA RAUTERKUS and DAVID V. RAUTERKUS
Defendant: DENISE COLEMAN, NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00240
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. AND NOW, this 9th day of October, 2019, upon consent of the parties, the Temporary Restraining Order granted by this Court on 08/26/19, which restrains Defendants from commencing construction on Plaintiffs' property, shall remain in full force and effect until 11/01/19, which is currently the scheduled date of the hearing on Plaintiffs' request for Preliminary Injunction. If at Defendants' request the hearing is continued to a date after 11/1/19, the Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until such rescheduled date. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/09/19. (esa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Order for Consent of Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. (Heurich, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 Brief in Opposition to Motion, filed by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. (Mathews, Lauren)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF in Opposition re #6 Motion for TRO, filed by DENISE COLEMAN, NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (McHale, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Heurich, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A - Erie before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 09/06/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion to Continue; granting #24 Motion To Set Briefing Schedule. Hearing before District Judge Marilyn J. Horan is hereby canceled and a new hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction will be set by separate order. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction [ECF 6] shall be filed by September 13, 2019. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing, and MOTION to Set a Briefing Schedule by DENISE COLEMAN, NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McHale, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew McHale on behalf of DENISE COLEMAN, NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McHale, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (U.S. Attorney and Attorney General of the United States) (Attachments: #1 Summons) (cel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Heurich, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Heurich, John)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RECEIPT from The Lynch Law Group LLC in the amount of $5,000.00 for Funds to be Deposited Per Order of Court signed by Judge Horan on 8/26/2019 at Document Number #16 received on 8/27/2019. (cel) Modified text on 8/28/2019. (cel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista Kochosky on behalf of DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS. (Kochosky, Krista)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren L. Mathews on behalf of DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS. (Mathews, Lauren)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The Court concludes:Plaintiffs would suffer irreparable harm, loss and injury unless a temporary restraining order were not issued and the construction on the property is permitted to commence; Plaintiffs are ordered to post security in the amount of five-thousand dollars and zero cents ($5,000.00). A check or money order payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court shall be deposited with the Clerks Office for the Western District of Pennsylvania. The Clerk is directed to deposit said monies in a non-interest-bearing account until further Order of Court; Upon the posting of the bond, Defendants will be restrained from commencing construction on Plaintiffs property until such time that this matter may be heard by the Court; and Plaintiffs shall serve this order upon defense parties/agents immediately. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/26/2019. (bjl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT Amended Certificate of Service by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. Amendment to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Heurich, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT Amended Certificate of Service by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. Amendment to #7 Brief in Support of Motion,. (Heurich, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED DOCUMENT Amended Certification of Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 65(b) by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. Amendment to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Heurich, John)
August 26, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Amended Document, #10 Amended Document, #9 Amended Document. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ERROR: SIGNATURE AND FILER DO NOT MATCH; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; AMENDED DOCUMENT Amended Certificate of Service by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. Amendment to #7 Brief in Support of Motion. (Mathews, Lauren) Modified text on 8/26/2019. (cel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ERROR: SIGNATURE AND FILER DO NOT MATCH; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; AMENDED DOCUMENT Amended Certificate of Service by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. Amendment to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Mathews, Lauren) Modified text on 8/26/2019. (cel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ERROR: SIGNATURE AND FILER DO NOT MATCH; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; AMENDED DOCUMENT Amended Certification of Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 65(b) by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS. Amendment to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Mathews, Lauren) Modified text on 8/26/2019. (cel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #6 Motion for TRO, by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS. (Heurich, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion for TRO, filed by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Heurich, John) Modified text on 8/26/2019. (cel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Heurich, John) Modified text on 8/26/2019. (cel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DENISE COLEMAN, NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (jd)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Heurich, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Heurich, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Heurich, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENISE COLEMAN, NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5254673), filed by DAVID V. RAUTERKUS, MARIA RAUTERKUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAUTERKUS et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE COLEMAN
Represented By: Matthew McHale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATURAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE
Represented By: Matthew McHale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew McHale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA RAUTERKUS
Represented By: John J. Heurich
Represented By: Lauren L. Mathews
Represented By: Krista Kochosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID V. RAUTERKUS
Represented By: John J. Heurich
Represented By: Lauren L. Mathews
Represented By: Krista Kochosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?