KOLESAR v. NABFLY, INC.
Plaintiff: RONALD C. KOLESAR
Defendant: NABFLY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00241
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 1:19-cv-00228, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 1:19-cv-00228. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/4/19. (lck)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RONALD C. KOLESAR. NABFLY, INC. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Carlson, R.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NABFLY, INC. (jjg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NABFLY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5257936), filed by RONALD C. KOLESAR. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOLESAR v. NABFLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD C. KOLESAR
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Kevin W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NABFLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?