SCUTELLA v. ERIE COUNTY PRISON et al
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Defendant: LT. STEVENS, WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES, MEDICAL DIRECTORER JANE DOE, ERIE COUNTY PRISON, AMANDA HOLBY and AMBER CHAFFEE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00245
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/23/2019. (dm)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, The Court is in receipt of USM285 forms for defendants Wexford Health Services and Erie County Prison. Plaintiff is directed to provide completed USM285 forms for each defendant named in his complaint. Completed USM285 forms due October 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/15/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against AMBER CHAFFEE, JANE DOE, ERIE COUNTY PRISON, AMANDA HOLBY, STEVENS, WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES ), filed by JHEN SCUTELLA. (cjo)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/25/2019. (dm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Authorization by Prisoner, #2 Inmate Account Statement, #3 Envelope) (cjo)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case administratively closed, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may reopen the case by (i) tendering to the "Clerk, U.S. District Court," a statutory filing fee in the amount of $350.00, plus an administrative filing fee in the amount of $50.00, for a total of $400.00 or (ii) submitting another motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required affidavit and a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/3/2019. (dm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCUTELLA v. ERIE COUNTY PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL DIRECTORER JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA HOLBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER CHAFFEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?