GRAHAM et al v. DMG MORI USA, INC.
Plaintiff: ADAM GRAHAM and GINA GRAHAM
Defendant: DMG MORI USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00281
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by DMG MORI USA, INC.. (Gill, Trisha)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Initial ADR Conference by DMG MORI USA, INC.. Initial ADR Conference Date December 19, 2019 (Gill, Trisha)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gill, Trisha)
October 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/19 at 11:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED for 12/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room A-240 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. (esa)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/25/19 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED AND RESCHEDULED for 12/12/19 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/22/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue ICMC by ADAM GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion for Continuance) (Reagle, Jason)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying DMG MORI Co. Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DMG MORI USA, INC.. (Gill, Trisha)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Case Management set for 11/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room A-240 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/31/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/10/19. (esa)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/10/19. (esa)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) and Affirmative Defenses by DMG MORI USA, INC.. (Gill, Trisha)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Venango County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-751 Copies attached: Amended Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5295593), filed by DMG MORI USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM et al v. DMG MORI USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMG MORI USA, INC.
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Represented By: Christopher M. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM GRAHAM
Represented By: Jason D. Reagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA GRAHAM
Represented By: Jason D. Reagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?