KING v. BENNAGE-GREGORY et al
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE KING
Defendant: WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY, TONY STAIR, JOHN DOE, STONE and JESSICA WELCH
Case Number: 1:2019cv00318
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on 11/4/2019 as to TONY STAIR, JESSICA WELCH, WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY, STONE. Answer due by TONY STAIR, JESSICA WELCH, WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY, STONE on 11/25/2019 (Hoke, Kelly) Modified text on 12/3/2019 to insert waiver executed date and answer due date. (jv)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY, TONY STAIR, STONE, JESSICA WELCH. (Hoke, Kelly)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J. Hoke on behalf of WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY, TONY STAIR, STONE, JESSICA WELCH. (Hoke, Kelly)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LAWRENCE KING. WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; TONY STAIR served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; STONE served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; JESSICA WELCH served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Receipt, #3 Receipt, #4 Receipt) (Mizner, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY, JOHN DOE, TONY STAIR, STONE, JESSICA WELCH (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (ma)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY, JOHN DOE, TONY STAIR, STONE, JESSICA WELCH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5344126), filed by LAWRENCE KING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING v. BENNAGE-GREGORY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE KING
Represented By: John F. Mizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BENNAGE-GREGORY
Represented By: Kelly J. Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY STAIR
Represented By: Kelly J. Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STONE
Represented By: Kelly J. Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA WELCH
Represented By: Kelly J. Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?