WARNER et al v. SWEPI, LP et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD W. ZINK, JOHN L. STEWART, GILDA GIANCOLA, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, DELPHINE MASON, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, TRACY L. MILIARA, KELLI K. KIMMEY, ROBERT E. SURRENA, JEANINE A. ANTHONY, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, DENISE LYN BRYDON, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, LINDA F. BARNES, KAREN S. MILLER, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, JOHN J. HOOVER, JOHN L. ERWIN, BARBARA L. LEWIS, SANDY J. GUISTE, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, TINA M. IRWIN, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, EMLENTON STORAGE LP, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, DARLENE A. HANNA, ODESSA CONWAY, ERIC S. SMERKAR, ALMA LEE BRITT, SARA ANN MORGAN, CARL JAMES HARTLE, GEORGENE BEMIS, JAMES T. WILSON, KEITH A. CHOFF, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, DIANA J. BICKEL, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, RAEMAN E. HANNA, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, STEPHEN WARNER, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR., PAMELA J. EXLEY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, JUDY D. BICKEL, JAMES M. REISINGER, EVELYN K. STEWART, ROBERT E. EXLEY, DAVID M. GRONER, TERESA A. CHRISTY, ROBERT R. EVANS, JAMES R. DAVIS, MARGARET S. FLEMING, RONALD R. BICKEL, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, FLOYD FOSTER, JR., CHRISTINE F. BOYD, JAMES J. HAUGH, GLENN A. BOYD, KEVIN J. RYAN, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, MARCIA L. GORDON CLARK, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, SUSAN J. GRONER, GARY C. BARNES, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR., JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, SUNNER R. BEMIS, JODI L. SMERKAR, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID T. TYGERT, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, DAWN M. MILLER, LARRY D. FLEMING, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, ROGERS HOLDINGS, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, BARRETT N. CLARK, KAREN S. LATSHAW, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, JANICE R. GUILINGER, DANIEL J. CONNORS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, GILBERT W. GRAY, RODGERS HOLDINGS, RICHARD P. KOSANOVIC, ROBERT J. HOSKIN, EMLENTON STORAGE, MARTIN C. GIEBEL, DAVID HAMMILL, STEPHEN L. WARNER, CLIFFORD E. BLAUSER, DONALD E. BLAUSER, DOROTHY B. DAVIS, DIANNA J. ERWIN, SUMNER R. BEMIS, MARGARET ANN KOZIELL, CAROL SPELLMAN SELTZ, JOSEPH P. JR. WALSH, DONNA J. HOSKIN, GERALD D. CUNNINGHAM, SANDRA L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL D. RYAN, JANE TIMPANO, GREGORY MARK LEWIS, MARCIA L. GORDAN, HELEN M. SPELLMAN, BRADLEY J. TWIEST, TRACY L. TWIEST and STELLA SEWCHOK
Defendant: SWEPI, LP and SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00326
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 1/10/2020. (cel)
January 2, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC on 1/31/2020; SWEPI, LP on 1/31/2020 (cel)
December 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Mercer on behalf of SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI, LP. (Mercer, Jeremy)
December 24, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #4 Amended Complaint Local Rule 7.E Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint to 1/31/2020. by SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI, LP. (Mercer, Jeremy) Modified text on 12/27/2019. (cel) Modified text on 1/2/2020. (ept)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service -Shell Energy Holdings GP, LLC served on CT Corporation System on December 5, 2019, filed by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUMNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CLIFFORD E. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, DONALD E. BLAUSER, SANDRA L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, GERALD D. CUNNINGHAM, DOROTHY B. DAVIS, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE, DIANNA J. ERWIN, JOHN L. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARTIN C. GIEBEL, MARCIA L. GORDAN, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DAVID HAMMILL, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, DONNA J. HOSKIN, ROBERT J. HOSKIN, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, RICHARD P. KOSANOVIC, MARGARET ANN KOZIELL, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, GREGORY MARK LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, MICHAEL D. RYAN, CAROL SPELLMAN SELTZ, STELLA SEWCHOK, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, HELEN M. SPELLMAN, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, JANE TIMPANO, BRADLEY J. TWIEST, TRACY L. TWIEST, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, JOSEPH P. JR. WALSH, STEPHEN L. WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK. (Altomare, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service - SWEPI, L.P. served on CT Corporation System on December 5, 2019, filed by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUMNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CLIFFORD E. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, DONALD E. BLAUSER, SANDRA L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, GERALD D. CUNNINGHAM, DOROTHY B. DAVIS, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE, DIANNA J. ERWIN, JOHN L. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARTIN C. GIEBEL, MARCIA L. GORDAN, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DAVID HAMMILL, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, DONNA J. HOSKIN, ROBERT J. HOSKIN, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, RICHARD P. KOSANOVIC, MARGARET ANN KOZIELL, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, GREGORY MARK LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, MICHAEL D. RYAN, CAROL SPELLMAN SELTZ, STELLA SEWCHOK, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, HELEN M. SPELLMAN, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, JANE TIMPANO, BRADLEY J. TWIEST, TRACY L. TWIEST, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, JOSEPH P. JR. WALSH, STEPHEN L. WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK. (Altomare, Joseph)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Status Conference held on October 23, 2019 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeanne Sykes, Telephone number 814-881-6656. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 12/10/2019. Redaction Request due 12/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2020. (jlf) Document removed from view. It was docketed at the correct case number 1:13-cv-102. Modified text on 12/9/2019. (ept)
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI, LP (jmm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Errata re #6 Praecipe to Issue Summons by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUMNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CLIFFORD E. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, DONALD E. BLAUSER, SANDRA L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, GERALD D. CUNNINGHAM, DOROTHY B. DAVIS, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE, DIANNA J. ERWIN, JOHN L. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARTIN C. GIEBEL, MARCIA L. GORDAN, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DAVID HAMMILL, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, DONNA J. HOSKIN, ROBERT J. HOSKIN, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, RICHARD P. KOSANOVIC, MARGARET ANN KOZIELL, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, GREGORY MARK LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, MICHAEL D. RYAN, CAROL SPELLMAN SELTZ, STELLA SEWCHOK, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, HELEN M. SPELLMAN, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, JANE TIMPANO, BRADLEY J. TWIEST, TRACY L. TWIEST, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, JOSEPH P. JR. WALSH, STEPHEN L. WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK. Reason for Correction: Missing Praecipe. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Altomare, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Errata re #5 Praecipe to Issue Summons by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUMNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CLIFFORD E. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, DONALD E. BLAUSER, SANDRA L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, GERALD D. CUNNINGHAM, DOROTHY B. DAVIS, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE, DIANNA J. ERWIN, JOHN L. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARTIN C. GIEBEL, MARCIA L. GORDAN, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DAVID HAMMILL, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, DONNA J. HOSKIN, ROBERT J. HOSKIN, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, RICHARD P. KOSANOVIC, MARGARET ANN KOZIELL, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, GREGORY MARK LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, MICHAEL D. RYAN, CAROL SPELLMAN SELTZ, STELLA SEWCHOK, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, HELEN M. SPELLMAN, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, JANE TIMPANO, BRADLEY J. TWIEST, TRACY L. TWIEST, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, JOSEPH P. JR. WALSH, STEPHEN L. WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK. Reason for Correction: Missing Praecipe. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Altomare, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Praecipe to Issue Summons, #6 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: Praecipe incomplete. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to refile Praecipe as the main document and the summons as an attachment using Errata event.
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUNNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE LP, DIANNA J. ERWIN, JOHN L. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARCIA L. GORDON CLARK, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, STEPHEN WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK (Altomare, Joseph) Document hidden from public view and redocketed at #8 . Modified text on 11/29/2019. (jmm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUNNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE LP, DIANNA J. ERWIN, JOHN L. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARCIA L. GORDON CLARK, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, STEPHEN WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK (Altomare, Joseph) Document hidden from public view and redocketed at #7 . Modified text on 11/29/2019. (jmm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants, filed by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUNNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE LP, DIANNA J. ERWIN, JOHN L. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARCIA L. GORDON CLARK, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, STEPHEN WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Altomare, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amended Complaint due on or before 11/25/19. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/14/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUNNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE LP, JOHN L. ERWIN, DIANNA J. ERWIN, ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARCIA L. GORDON CLARK, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, STEPHEN WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Altomare, Joseph)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC, SWEPI, LP (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5352426), filed by JEANINE A. ANTHONY, PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH, RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH, GARY C. BARNES, LINDA F. BARNES, KATHLEEN C. BARRETT, GEORGENE BEMIS, SUNNER R. BEMIS, JUDY D. BICKEL, RONALD R. BICKEL, CLAYTON L. BLAUSER, CONNIE L. BLAUSER, MICHAEL B. BONETTI, BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER, DONALD J. BOOKWALTER, CHRISTINE F. BOYD, GLENN A. BOYD, ALMA LEE BRITT, DENISE LYN BRYDON, SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON, KEITH A. CHOFF, JENNIFER S. CHRISTY, TERESA A. CHRISTY, BARRETT N. CLARK, DANIEL J. CONNORS, SANDRA D. CONNORS, ODESSA CONWAY, JAMES R. DAVIS, HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN, EMLENTON STORAGE LP, JOHN L. ERWIN, DIANNA J. ERWIN,ROBERT R. EVANS, PAMELA J. EXLEY, ROBERT E. EXLEY, LARRY D. FLEMING, MARGARET S. FLEMING, FLOYD FOSTER, JR, ALFRED L. FREEMAN, ROBYN D. FREEMAN, MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN, SHIA S. FRISHKORN, FLORENCE R. GEIBEL, GILDA GIANCOLA, SERGIO B. GIANCOLA, MARCIA L. GORDON CLARK, GILBERT W. GRAY, DAVID M. GRONER, SUSAN J. GRONER, GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC, CLARENCE R. GUILINGER, JANICE R. GUILINGER, MALCOLM L. GUISTE, SANDY J. GUISTE, DARLENE A. HANNA, RAEMAN E. HANNA, ANNA HELEN HARTLE, CARL JAMES HARTLE, JAMES J. HAUGH, JOSEPH E. HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN, RODGERS HOLDINGS, JOHN J. HOOVER, BETH A. HUTCHINSON, MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON, JEFFREY S. IRWIN, TINA M. IRWIN, LARRY E. KEVERLINE, PAMELA J. KEVERLINE, DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY, KELLI K. KIMMEY, KAREN S. LATSHAW, BARBARA L. LEWIS, SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS, STEPHEN J. LEWIS, DELPHINE MASON, WILLIAM J. MASON, DAVID J. MCCUNE, III, LAUREN E. MCCUNE, TRACY L. MILIARA, DANIEL J. MILLER, JR, DANIEL J. MILLER, SR, DAWN M. MILLER, KAREN S. MILLER, SARA ANN MORGAN, BARBARA L. OLIPHANT, JAMES R. OLIPHANT, MARC J. RASSCHAERT, JAMES M. REISINGER, PATRICIA A. REISINGER, KEVIN J. RYAN, ROBERT D. SHAFFER, ERIC S. SMERKAR, JODI L. SMERKAR, EVELYN K. STEWART, JOHN L. STEWART, ROBERT E. SURRENA, CYNTHIA A. TYGERT, DAVID T. TYGERT, STEPHEN WARNER, JAMES T. WILSON, BARBARA A. YAKIMICK, JOHN P. YAKIMICK, RICHARD W. ZINK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARNER et al v. SWEPI, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD W. ZINK
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN L. STEWART
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILDA GIANCOLA
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORENCE R. GEIBEL
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH A. HUTCHINSON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL JOSEPH BRYDON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERGIO B. GIANCOLA
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELPHINE MASON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. REISINGER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY L. MILIARA
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLI K. KIMMEY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. SURRENA
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANINE A. ANTHONY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT MICHAEL LEWIS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE LYN BRYDON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD J. BOOKWALTER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC J. RASSCHAERT
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA F. BARNES
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN S. MILLER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN E. MCCUNE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. HOOVER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN L. ERWIN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA L. LEWIS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDY J. GUISTE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRONER ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA M. IRWIN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA A. TYGERT
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMLENTON STORAGE LP
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS G. KIMMEY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA J. KEVERLINE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY J. DUCKSTEIN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE A. HANNA
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ODESSA CONWAY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC S. SMERKAR
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA LEE BRITT
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA ANN MORGAN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL JAMES HARTLE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGENE BEMIS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES T. WILSON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH A. CHOFF
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. YAKIMICK
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA J. BICKEL
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL B. BONETTI
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA D. CONNORS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA HELEN HARTLE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAYTON L. BLAUSER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAEMAN E. HANNA
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARENCE R. GUILINGER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBYN D. FREEMAN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN WARNER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL J. MILLER, JR.
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA J. EXLEY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. ASHBAUGH
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY D. BICKEL
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES M. REISINGER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN K. STEWART
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. EXLEY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID M. GRONER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA A. CHRISTY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT R. EVANS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. DAVIS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET S. FLEMING
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD R. BICKEL
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT D. SHAFFER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD FOSTER, JR.
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE F. BOYD
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. HAUGH
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN A. BOYD
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN J. RYAN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE GRAY HOGAN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA L. GORDON CLARK
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY E. KEVERLINE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIA S. FRISHKORN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER S. CHRISTY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN J. GRONER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY C. BARNES
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL J. MILLER, SR.
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH E. HENDERSON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNNER R. BEMIS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODI L. SMERKAR
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNIE L. BLAUSER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW S. FRISHKORN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD E. ASHBAUGH
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J. MASON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID T. TYGERT
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA S. BOOKWALTER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA L. OLIPHANT
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALCOLM L. GUISTE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN M. MILLER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY D. FLEMING
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL P. HUTCHINSON
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY S. IRWIN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN C. BARRETT
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGERS HOLDINGS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. OLIPHANT
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED L. FREEMAN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRETT N. CLARK
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN S. LATSHAW
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN P. YAKIMICK
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J. MCCUNE, III
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE R. GUILINGER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL J. CONNORS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN J. LEWIS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT W. GRAY
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODGERS HOLDINGS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD P. KOSANOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. HOSKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMLENTON STORAGE
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN C. GIEBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HAMMILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN L. WARNER
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD E. BLAUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD E. BLAUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY B. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNA J. ERWIN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMNER R. BEMIS
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET ANN KOZIELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL SPELLMAN SELTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH P. JR. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA J. HOSKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD D. CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA L. BLAUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE TIMPANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY MARK LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA L. GORDAN
Represented By: Joseph E. Altomare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN M. SPELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY J. TWIEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY L. TWIEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLA SEWCHOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWEPI, LP
Represented By: Jeremy A. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL ENERGY HOLDING GP, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy A. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?