SCUTELLA v. ERIE COUNTY PRISON et al
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Defendant: MARCELL MALLORY, KEVEN STUTTER, KATHY GRAY, AMBER CHAFFE, SARA SIMMONS, ED SLUBOSKI, ERIE COUNTY PRISON, MICHEAL HOLMAN, STUART DONAHUE, GARY SEYMOUR and HEATHER MARTIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00354
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Submit Exhibit B. The Court construes Plaintiff's Motion to seek leave to attach an attachment to his Complaint. The Court grants this request. The Clerk is directed to remove Exhibit B and attach it to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on January 24, 2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (zsb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION submit Exhibit B by JHEN SCUTELLA. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #5 Report and Recommendation by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JHEN SCUTELLA. (jd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against AMBER CHAFFE, STUART DONAHUE, ERIE COUNTY PRISON, KATHY GRAY, MICHEAL HOLMAN, MARCELL MALLORY, HEATHER MARTIN, GARY SEYMOUR, SARA SIMMONS, ED SLUBOSKI, KEVEN STUTTER ), filed by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #2 Exhibit B) (jv)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver and this order to each defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 1/14/2020. (dm)
January 14, 2020 Service copies placed in US Marshal box. (dm)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JHEN SCUTELLA. It is respectfully recommended that Scutella's motion by DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2020; Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 1/10/2020. (dm)
January 10, 2020 Case reassigned to Presiding Judge Susan Paradise Baxter and referred to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. (sdp)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO filed by JHEN SCUTELLA. (cjo)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cjo)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/4/2019. (dm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JHEN SCUTELLA. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Consent to Trial by U.S District Judge or Magistrate Judge, #5 Envelope) (cjo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #6 authorization and account statement) (jd)
December 2, 2019 Remark: 4 usm 285 forms received with multiple defendants listed on each form (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCUTELLA v. ERIE COUNTY PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCELL MALLORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVEN STUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY GRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER CHAFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARA SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED SLUBOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEAL HOLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY SEYMOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JHEN SCUTELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?