TEJEDA v. FCI MCKEAN
Plaintiff: ALEX TEJEDA
Defendant: FCI MCKEAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00356
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, PRESIDING, and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, REFERRAL. (jd)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ALEX TEJEDA. It is hereby recommended that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #1 ] be granted. It is further recommended that this action be dismissed as legally frivolous and for failureto state a claim upon which relief may be granted in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2020. Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 1/8/2020. (dm)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/30/2019. (dm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALEX TEJEDA. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Statement, #2 Petition, #3 Consent to Jurisdiction, #4 Envelope) (jmm)
December 3, 2019 *** Case Assigned to Category Number 4 (jmm) Modified text on 12/4/2019. (jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEJEDA v. FCI MCKEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI MCKEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX TEJEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?