HALL v. LAKE CITY BOROUGH
Plaintiff: COURTNEY HALL
Defendant: LAKE CITY BOROUGH
Case Number: 1:2020cv00173
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LAKE CITY BOROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Lavery, Frank)
August 5, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re Application for Refund. ERROR: Document filed in wrong case. CORRECTION: Attorney instructed to file any refunds at 2:07-mc-203. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. LAKE CITY BOROUGH answer due 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/28/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by LAKE CITY BOROUGH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Non-Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Kramer on behalf of LAKE CITY BOROUGH. (Kramer, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Lavery, Jr on behalf of LAKE CITY BOROUGH. (Lavery, Frank)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COURTNEY HALL (Andrezeski, Anthony)
July 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LAKE CITY BOROUGH (jjg)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAKE CITY BOROUGH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5733315), filed by COURTNEY HALL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. LAKE CITY BOROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY HALL
Represented By: Anthony B. Andrezeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKE CITY BOROUGH
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Kramer
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?