GUIDO v. THE PENN WARRANTY CORP.
Petitioner: LOUIS GUIDO
Respondent: THE PENN WARRANTY CORP.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00198
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00507. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Change Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/10/20 (jam)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Penn Warranty Corp..(Giotto, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Penn Warranty Corp..(Giotto, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue by The Penn Warranty Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B)(Giotto, Thomas)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Louis Guido. The Penn Warranty Corp. waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Sugiura, Sammy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within thirty (30) days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/1/20. (jam)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Penn Warranty Corp. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Penn Warranty Corp. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5049686), filed by Louis Guido. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUIDO v. THE PENN WARRANTY CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE PENN WARRANTY CORP.
Represented By: Thomas S. Giotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LOUIS GUIDO
Represented By: Sammy Y. Sugiura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?