ZIMMERMAN v. C.R. BARD, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RAY ZIMMERMAN
Defendant: C.R. BARD, INC., RODOLFO ARREOLA, M.D., JAY J. KIESSLING, M.D., DAVOL, INC., MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE and BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00218
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Remark: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:20-cv-04377, filed 08/27/2020. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ma)
August 24, 2020 Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Ohio. (ma)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Southern District of Ohio. (ma)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (ma)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by RAY ZIMMERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Licata, Joshua)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by RAY ZIMMERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Licata, Joshua)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/6/20. (jhi)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying C.R. BARD, INC. as corporate parent to DAVOL, INC.; BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY as corporate parent to C.R. BARD, INC.; and T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. as other affiliate to BECTON, DICKINSON and COMPANY. (McIntyre, John) Modified on 8/10/2020 (ma).
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Erie County, case number 10863-2020 with Jury Demand Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Notice of Filing (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5812429), filed by DAVOL, INC., BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY, C.R. BARD, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZIMMERMAN v. C.R. BARD, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. BARD, INC.
Represented By: John M. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODOLFO ARREOLA, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY J. KIESSLING, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVOL, INC.
Represented By: John M. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF ERIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECTON, DICKINSON AND COMPANY
Represented By: John M. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: Kevin S. Burger
Represented By: Peter D. Friday
Represented By: Joshua S. Licata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?