SUMINSKI v. THE DIOCESE OF ERIE
Plaintiff: RICHARD SUMINSKI
Defendant: THE DIOCESE OF ERIE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00244
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this case is STAYED pending the Pennsylvania Supreme Court's resolution of the appeal in Rice v. Dioscese of Altoona-Johnstown, et al., Docket No. 3 WAP 2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/14/2020. (esa)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Stay filed by THE DIOCESE OF ERIE. (Feczko, Mark)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay by THE DIOCESE OF ERIE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feczko, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Christina Graziano to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/5/2020. (esa)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RICHARD SUMINSKI. (Graziano, Christina)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by RICHARD SUMINSKI. Movant is directed to file a Proposed Order to accompany Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/2/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE DIOCESE OF ERIE, filed by RICHARD SUMINSKI. (Ketterer, Brian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File by RICHARD SUMINSKI. (Ketterer, Brian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Christina Graziano to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5958198) by RICHARD SUMINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Graziano, Christina)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by THE DIOCESE OF ERIE Answer due from THE DIOCESE OF ERIE on 10/1/2020. (Lacy, Stefanie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate re #1 Notice of Removal, by THE DIOCESE OF ERIE. (jv)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Erie County, case number 11659-2020 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5845240), filed by THE DIOCESE OF ERIE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Including Complaint) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUMINSKI v. THE DIOCESE OF ERIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SUMINSKI
Represented By: Brian D. Ketterer
Represented By: Brian D Ketterer
Represented By: Christina Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DIOCESE OF ERIE
Represented By: Stefanie Lacy
Represented By: Mark D. Feczko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?