WILLIAMS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: OLIVER O. WILLIAMS
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00245
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Donetta W Ambrose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF) ), filed by OLIVER O. WILLIAMS. (elt)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 8/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps)
August 20, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (elt)
August 20, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (elt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by OLIVER O. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint LODGED, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) Modified on 8/20/2020 (elt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIVER O. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Michael S. JanJanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?