SILBAUGH v. NELSON et al
Plaintiff: HANNAH SILBAUGH
Defendant: DAVID SMITH, ANTHONY ATTALLA, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, JOHN DOE 5, DANIEL SPIZARNY, JOHN DOE 4 and CITY OF ERIE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00252
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #12 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/5/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Moodey Doyle on behalf of ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Doyle, Catherine)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Moodey Doyle on behalf of ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Doyle, Catherine)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint #11 Answer to Amended Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Krepps, Paul)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 EXHIBITS B to Certificate of Conferral in Support of #14 Errata by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Garcia, G.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBITS A to Certificate of Conferral in Support of #14 Errata by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Garcia, G.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 Errata re #12 Motion to Dismiss Certificate of Conferral by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. Reason for Correction: need to attach document. (Garcia, G.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Garcia, G.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garcia, G.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Krepps, Paul)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants are ORDERED to file a response by 10/2/2020.Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/10/2020. (esa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, filed by HANNAH SILBAUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (McNair, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint, by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Garcia, G.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Michael Garcia, II on behalf of ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Garcia, G.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, JOHN DOE 4, JOHN DOE 5, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH ANTHONY ATTALLA answer due 9/18/2020; CITY OF ERIE answer due 9/18/2020; JOHN DOE 4 answer due 9/18/2020; JOHN DOE 5 answer due 9/18/2020; MARC NELSON answer due 9/18/2020; JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER answer due 9/18/2020; DAVID SMITH answer due 9/18/2020, filed by HANNAH SILBAUGH. (McNair, Timothy)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 10/2/2020.Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/2/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,, , filed by HANNAH SILBAUGH. (McNair, Timothy)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by HANNAH SILBAUGH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McNair, Timothy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,, by ANTHONY ATTALLA, CITY OF ERIE, MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DAVID SMITH, DANIEL SPIZARNY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Krepps, Paul)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Erie County, case number 11247-2020 with jury demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-586721), filed by MARC NELSON, JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER, DANIEL SPIZARNY, DAVID SMITH, CITY OF ERIE, ANTHONY ATTALLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Praecipe, #2 Exhibit B-Notice, #3 Exhibit C-Case report, #4 Exhibit D-Sheriff's return of service, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-Motion for protective order, #7 Exhibit G-Brief in support, #8 Exhibit H-Order, #9 Exhibit I-Complaint, #10 Exhibit J-Motion to amend, #11 Exhibit K-Jury demand, #12 Exhibit L-Notice to defend, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILBAUGH v. NELSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANNAH SILBAUGH
Represented By: Timothy D. McNair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SMITH
Represented By: Paul D. Krepps
Represented By: G. Michael Garcia, II
Represented By: Catherine Moodey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY ATTALLA
Represented By: Paul D. Krepps
Represented By: G. Michael Garcia, II
Represented By: Catherine Moodey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC NELSON
Represented By: Paul D. Krepps
Represented By: G. Michael Garcia, II
Represented By: Catherine Moodey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH V. SCHEMBER
Represented By: Paul D. Krepps
Represented By: G. Michael Garcia, II
Represented By: Catherine Moodey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 5
Represented By: Catherine Moodey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SPIZARNY
Represented By: Paul D. Krepps
Represented By: G. Michael Garcia, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 4
Represented By: Catherine Moodey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ERIE
Represented By: Paul D. Krepps
Represented By: G. Michael Garcia, II
Represented By: Catherine Moodey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?