KARLENE et al v. YOUNG et al
Plaintiff: GARY KARLENE and PAMELA KARLENE
Defendant: THE KEYSTONE RURAL HEALTH CONSORTIA, INC. trading and doing business as THE KANE DENTAL CENTER, CHRISTOPHER YOUNG and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00292
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/14/2020. (esa)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: AND NOW, this 14th day of October, upon consideration of the United States of America's Motion for Substitution of Party, and upon further consideration of any response thereto, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and Defendants, Christopher Young, D.D.S., and the Keystone Rural Health Consortia, Inc., t/d/b/a the Kane Dental Center, are dismissed, with prejudice, from this action, and the United States of America is substituted as a Defendant with respect to Plaintiffs' claims for all further proceedings in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter shall be re-captioned to reflect that substitution. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/14/2020. (esa)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by THE KEYSTONE RURAL HEALTH CONSORTIA, INC., CHRISTOPHER YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Meredith Torres)) (Gal-Or, Karen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Without Prejudice by THE KEYSTONE RURAL HEALTH CONSORTIA, INC., CHRISTOPHER YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conferral, #2 Proposed Order) (Gal-Or, Karen)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Substitute Party filed by THE KEYSTONE RURAL HEALTH CONSORTIA, INC., CHRISTOPHER YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Meredith Torres), #2 Exhibit B (Certification of Scope of Employment)) (Gal-Or, Karen)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party by THE KEYSTONE RURAL HEALTH CONSORTIA, INC., CHRISTOPHER YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gal-Or, Karen)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MCKEAN COUNTY, case number 394CD2020 with jury demand Copies attached: state court record , filed by THE KEYSTONE RURAL HEALTH CONSORTIA, INC., CHRISTOPHER YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KARLENE et al v. YOUNG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY KARLENE
Represented By: Jon R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA KARLENE
Represented By: Jon R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE KEYSTONE RURAL HEALTH CONSORTIA, INC. trading and doing business as THE KANE DENTAL CENTER
Represented By: Karen Gal-Or
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER YOUNG
Represented By: Karen Gal-Or
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Karen Gal-Or
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?