WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant: PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC., JAMES MONSEES, ADAM BOWEN, RIAZ VALANI, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, JUUL LABS, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, NU MARK LLC and HOYOUNG HUH
Case Number: 1:2020cv00365
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint by WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Email) (Shuber, Jordan) Modified on 2/8/2021 to add document linkage (ept).
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 Remark: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-00244, filed 01/11/2021. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ept)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (Attachments: #1 Summons Altria Group, Inc., #2 Summons Bowen, #3 Summons Altria Group Distribution, #4 Summons Huh, #5 Summons Juul Labs, #6 Summons Monsees, #7 Summons Nu Mark, #8 Summons Phillip Morris, #9 Summons Pritzker, #10 Summons Valani) (ept)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Amended Case Management Order No. 3, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons) (Shuber, Jordan)
January 11, 2021 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California. (lar)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (lar)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Shuber, Jordan)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (lar)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (ept)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Summons) (King, Thomas)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JOHN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6181811), filed by WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MONSEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIAZ VALANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS PRITZKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU MARK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOYOUNG HUH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARREN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?