WAYNE GRAVEL, INC v. RS1 HOLDINGS
Plaintiff: WAYNE GRAVEL, INC doing business as WAYNE COMPANIES PAVING AND CONCRETE
Defendant: RS1 HOLDINGS doing business as PLANT OUTFITTERS LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00374
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw #5 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal. Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Service by U.S. Marshal is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 01/28/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION TO AUTHORIZE PERSONAL SERVICE re #3 Errata, #2 Summons Issued by WAYNE GRAVEL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Hutzelman, Stephen)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by WAYNE GRAVEL, INC. RS1 HOLDINGS served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service) (Hutzelman, Stephen)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Amended) by WAYNE GRAVEL, INC re #5 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal (Hutzelman, Stephen)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO AUTHORIZE PERSONAL SERVICE re #3 Errata, #2 Summons Issued by WAYNE GRAVEL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Service Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Hutzelman, Stephen) Modified on 1/27/2021 to change to title of document (jv).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WAYNE GRAVEL, INC. (Hutzelman, Stephen)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Errata re #1 Complaint, Quality Control message - Generic Correction, by WAYNE GRAVEL, INC. Reason for Correction: Pursuant to Clerk's Quality Control Message. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44, #6 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44A) (Hutzelman, Stephen)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RS1 HOLDINGS (jv)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Complaint has no space between RSI and Holdings on caption. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file an ERRATA with a space in between RSI and Holdings on caption of complaint and like it to #1 Complaint. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 1/11/2021. (jv)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RS1 HOLDINGS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6203972), filed by WAYNE GRAVEL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Part 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Part 2, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Judgment) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAYNE GRAVEL, INC v. RS1 HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE GRAVEL, INC doing business as WAYNE COMPANIES PAVING AND CONCRETE
Represented By: Stephen H. Hutzelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS1 HOLDINGS doing business as PLANT OUTFITTERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?