WILLIAMS v. JANSSEN PHARMAURICAL
Plaintiff: ANNETTE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMAURICAL and DR. WON SEO
Case Number: 1:2021cv00107
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT ORDER. FINAL JUDGMENT hereby is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case has been marked closed. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/26/21. (cyk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Consistent with the Court's Order dated 3/30/21 (Doc. #4 ), the case now is dismissed with prejudice, and a Rule 58 judgment order will issue. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/26/21. (cyk)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMAURICAL, WON SEO, filed by ANNETTE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D) (ma)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Amended complaint due by 4/23/21. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/13/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cyk)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #3 Complaint by ANNETTE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS. (ma)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, without prejudice to the filing of an amended complaint. Should Plaintiff wish to file an amended complaint, she must do so by 4/13/21. If Plaintiff does not timely file an amended complaint, identifying a valid jurisdictional basis for proceeding, the Court will convert the dismissal to one with prejudice. Finally, Plaintiff must make last, best efforts in these regards, because further opportunity for amendment will not be afforded. See contents of filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/30/21. (cyk)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMAURICAL, filed by ANNETTE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS. (ma)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and the Clerk is directed to file the complaint. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/24/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. Staff note: a copy of this filing will be sent, via First-Class U.S. Mail, to Plaintiff's address of record. (dcd)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANNETTE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. JANSSEN PHARMAURICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMAURICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. WON SEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?