KELSCH v. BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH KELSCH
Defendant: BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD and GENESEE & WYOMING INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00119
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A. Katz on behalf of JOSEPH KELSCH. (Katz, Lawrence)
June 8, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Proposed Discovery Plan. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Removed from public view since court re-docketed as #16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jv)
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD. (Clements, Scott)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD. (Clements, Scott) Modified on 6/8/2021 to remove from public view since court filed correctly as #16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (jv).
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria V. Carr on behalf of BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD. (Carr, Maria)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/10/21. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/10/21. (jhi)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD. (Clements, Scott)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying Genesee & Wyoming, Inc.; Brookfield Asset Management, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD. (Clements, Scott)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Dismiss Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. by BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD, GENESEE & WYOMING INC.. (Clements, Scott)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD, GENESEE & WYOMING INC.. (Johnston, J.)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD, GENESEE & WYOMING INC.. (Clements, Scott)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOSEPH KELSCH. GENESEE & WYOMING INC. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Myers, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOSEPH KELSCH. BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Myers, Robert)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/13/21. (jhi)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD, GENESEE & WYOMING INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jd)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD, GENESEE & WYOMING INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6454680), filed by JOSEPH KELSCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KELSCH v. BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO & PITTSBURGH RAILROAD
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: Maria V. Carr
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENESEE & WYOMING INC.
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH KELSCH
Represented By: Robert E. Myers
Represented By: Lawrence A. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?