REAGLE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. REAGLE
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2021cv00120
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:21-cv-06439, filed 05/10/2021. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cel)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Southern District of Indiana. (cel)
May 4, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of Southern Indiana. (cel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (cel)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6455906), filed by MICHAEL D. REAGLE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REAGLE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. REAGLE
Represented By: Joseph R. Froetschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?