ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE v. MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Defendant: MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD., MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION, GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD, MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD. and MIDEA USA INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00159
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD, MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD., MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (jd)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 Errata re 7 Praecipe to Issue Summons by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Reason for Correction: No Praecipe attached. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Boyd, Richard)
June 25, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 7 , 8 , 9 ,Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: Filer advised that there is no Praecipe, only summons attached to each entry CORRECTION: Please refile as one entry using the ERRATA Event a document titled Praecipe to Issue Summons, and attaching all 3 Summons to the main document as attachments.ACTION REQUIRED (jd)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION, MIDEA USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jd)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Boyd, Richard)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Boyd, Richard)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Boyd, Richard)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD, MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION, MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD., MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD., MIDEA USA INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6541660), filed by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)
June 2, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/9/2021. (jd) Modified on 6/14/2021 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE v. MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA AMERICA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GD MIDEA AIR-CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA GROUP CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDEA USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: Richard J. Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?