RODRIQUES v. CARNEY
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RODRIGUES and ANTHONY RODRIQUES
Defendant: MDJ THOMAS CARNEY, THOMAS CARNEY, MDJ EDWARD WILSON, EDWARD WILSON and COUNTY OF ERIE, PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 1:2022cv00025
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Liebenguth on behalf of THOMAS CARNEY(In his individual capacity), EDWARD WILSON. (Liebenguth, Caroline)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EDWARD WILSON. EDWARD WILSON waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Liebenguth, Caroline)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS CARNEY(In his individual capacity). THOMAS CARNEY(In his individual capacity) waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Liebenguth, Caroline)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to EDWARD WILSON (lyk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ANTHONY RODRIQUES (Rodriques, Anthony)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against THOMAS CARNEY, THOMAS CARNEY, MDJ ,COUNTY OF ERIE, PENNSYLVANIA, EDWARD WILSON , MDJ and EDWARD WILSON filed by ANTHONY RODRIQUES. (Rodriques, Anthony) Modified text on 3/1/2022. Added new parties and removed Answer Deadline statement as there is no proof parties have been served.
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to THOMAS CARNEY (elt)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ANTHONY RODRIGUES (Rodriques, Anthony)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS CARNEY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6914955), filed by ANTHONY RODRIGUES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIQUES v. CARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RODRIGUES
Represented By: ANTHONY RODRIGUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RODRIQUES
Represented By: ANTHONY RODRIQUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDJ THOMAS CARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS CARNEY
Represented By: Caroline Liebenguth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDJ EDWARD WILSON
Represented By: Caroline Liebenguth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ERIE, PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?