FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE v. APPLICATIONS INTERNA
Plaintiff: FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.
Defendant: APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Thirdparty_defendant: COMPUTER AID, INC
Counter_claimant: COMPUTER AID, INC
Counter_defendant: APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM LTD. and FEDEX SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2003cv01512
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER directing that, upon consideration of 325 Response to Order to Show Cause, defendant APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION shall pay to the Clerk of Court, within 10 days from the date of this order, the sum of $10,830.85 as payment in full of the assessed jury costs incurred in this matter; Show Cause hearing of 4/27/2010 at 2 PM is hereby cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 4/20/10. (map)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER directing that, for the reasons stated on the record, the court has been advised that the instant case has been resolved and the only remaining matter is the submission of a stipulation of discontinuance for approval by the court; Therefore, there being no further action needed by the court at this time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 3/24/10. (map)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER of Jury Selection Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 3/8/10. (map)
February 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER re-scheduling Jury Selection and Trial in the instant case from 2/16/2010 to 3/8/2010 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 2/12/10. (map)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting 238 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert testimony of Michael Shamos. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 2/11/10. (map)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 225 Motion for Leave to Amend Trial Exhibit List; Within 10 days of this order, defendant shall file an amended pre-trial exhibit list, as set forth in its Motion. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 7/28/09. (map)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 200 Motion to Reschedule Status Conference; Status conference of 9/22/2008 re-scheduled to 9/24/2008 at 2 PM. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 9/15/08. (map)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/22/2008 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 9/12/08. (map)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE v. APPLICATIONS INTERNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Allan W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Ronald L. Hicks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: COMPUTER AID, INC
Represented By: Patrick J. McElhinny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: COMPUTER AID, INC
Represented By: Patrick J. McElhinny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Ronald L. Hicks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM LTD.
Represented By: Patrick J. McElhinny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: FEDEX SUPPLY CHAIN SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Patrick J. McElhinny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?