MCKEITHAN v. BEARD et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00965
Filed: July 21, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Referring Judge: Francis X. Caiazza
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 243 Stipulation for Discontinuance, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 6/10/11. (map)
May 21, 2010 212 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 168 Motion for Summary Judgment and adopting 206 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the court. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 5/21/10. (map)
December 4, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 192 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 12/3/09. (map)
November 13, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 181 Motion for TRO and/or for Preliminary Injunction, granting 186 Motion for Extension of Time and directing that plaintiff's response to 168 Motion for Summary Judgment by filed on or before 12/18/2009, denying 186 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and granting 186 Motion for Notification of Transfer because plaintiff has informed the Court of his transfer to a new institution. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 11/9/09. (map)
October 14, 2009 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 178 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by DENNIS MCKEITHAN. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 10/13/09. (map)
September 30, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's Response to Summary Judgment due by 11/18/2009. Denying 174 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/30/09. (mlw)
July 7, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 152 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by DENNIS MCKEITHAN. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 7/7/09. (map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCKEITHAN v. BEARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?