JACOBS v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Plaintiff: ANDRE JACOBS
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH, ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS, PITTSBURGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE, RYAN TUTERA, RICHARD USNER, MICHAEL O'KEEFE, DAN ONORATO, WILLIAM EMERICK, RAMON RUSTIN, RONALD POFI, MAJOR DONNIS, LOUIS LEON, DALE CHAPMAN, ROBERT BEVERIDGE, BOZAK, ROBBIE PINDEL, KAVALS, MCCALL, STANTON, RUBEL, CRAPIS, NURSE ANITA, NURSE BETHANN and NURSE JANE DOE
Case Number: 2:2008cv00470
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Francis X. Caiazza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 679 OPINION setting forth the reasons the motion for stay and waver of bond requirement 677 will be GRANTED, the motions for a writ of execution 665 666 will be denied as premature, and the motion for reconsideration 664 will be denied. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/16/2018. (kjm)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 MEMORANDUM OPINION setting forth the reasons the renewed motion for the court to issue subpoenas 539 will be DENIED with prejudice. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/10/2017. (kjm)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 456 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 489 Report and Recommendations. 456 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED only as it relates to Defendant Dan Onorato. The M otion is DENIED as it relates to Defendants Robert Beveridge, Bozak, Dale Chapman, Crapis, Major Donnis, William Emerick, Kavals, Louis Leon, McCall, Robert Pindel, Ronald Pofi, Rubel, Ramon Rustin, and Stanton.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 489 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lenihan, dated August 1, 2016, is adopted as the opinion of the court. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/14/2016. (smc)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 460 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION re 427 MOTION for Sanctions (Records); and 425 MOTION for Sanctions (Video) filed by plaintiff ANDRE JACOBS. Correcting minor typographical errors in the court's original memorandum opinion 453 . Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/12/15. (bgm)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 427 MOTION for Sanctions (Records); and 425 MOTION for Sanctions (Video) filed by plaintiff ANDRE JACOBS. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying memorandum opinion, plaintiff's motions for spoliation sanctions will be denied. An appropriate order will follow. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/13/2015. (bgm)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER adopting 366 Report and Recommendation as the Opinion of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that for the reasons set forth in the Report and Recommendation, the Motions for Summary Judgment filed by the Allegheny County Defendants (ECF No. 320 ) and the Nurse Defendants (ECF No. 321 ) are DENIED to the extent they seek revocation of Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status and DENIED without prejudice to the extent they seek dismissal for Plaintiffs failure to exhaust his administr ative remedies. Motions may be refiled closer to the trial of this matter so that the Court may conduct an evidentiary hearing and make a determination about the factual disputes on the issue of exhaustion of Plaintiffs administrative remedies. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/10/2014. (smc )
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER that Plaintiff is required to pay the filing fee of $350.00 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b) and as more fully explained herein. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Superintendent of SCI-Albion where Plaintiff is currently incarcerated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on May 30, 2014. (kcc)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER re 360 plaintiff’s appeal of magistrate judge’s order (ECF No. 347 ) denying plaintiffs motion for discovery (ECF No. 342 ). Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/12/2014. (blr)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER on ECF No. 263 denying motion for disqualification and denying appeal of scheduling orders as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/29/2014. (blr)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER converting 320 Motion to Dismiss and 321 Motion to Dismiss into Motions for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is allowed until January 24, 2013, to respond to Defendants' motions. No extensions will be granted without just cause. If Plaintif f fails to comply with this orderr then the motions will be decided without the benefit of his response and the Court will consider dismissal of this action for his failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on December 27, 2013. (kcc)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on the 200 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by ANDRE JACOBS, the 204 MOTION to Take Deposition filed by ANDRE JACOBS and the 201 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Court to Rule on Outstanding Issues filed by ANDRE JACOBS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/16/2012. (jmb)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying without prejudice 101 Motion to Compel Discovery; denying 104 Motion to Appoint Counsel, as more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/3/2011. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff at his address of record.(dad)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 89 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 57 ) is GRANTED with respect to Defendant Tutera who is DISMISSED FROM THIS CASE. The motion is also GRANTED with respect to plaintiffs state law claims, but is DENIED in all other respects. The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Bissoon (Docket. No. 89 ), dated June 21, 2010, is adopted as the opinion of the court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/26/2010. (smc )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACOBS v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY BUREAU OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN TUTERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD USNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL O'KEEFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN ONORATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM EMERICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMON RUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD POFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR DONNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALE CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BEVERIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBBIE PINDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAVALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAPIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE ANITA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE BETHANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?