YUNIK v. MCVEY et al
Plaintiff: JAY V. YUNIK
Defendant: CATHERINE C. MCVEY, MICHAEL L. GREEN, JEFFREY R. IMBODEN, MATTHEW T. MANGINO, BENJAMIN A. MARTINEZ, GERALD N. MASSARO, MICHAEL M. WEBSTER, LLOYD A. WHITE, ALL JOHN DOE'S AND JANES DOE'S, JEFFREY A. BEARD, JOHN S. SHAFFER, JUDITH VIGLIONE, MS. SNYDER, MICHAEL W. HARLOW, FRED J. RUFFO, MR. MAHLEMISTER, MS. BAKER, WILLIAM (BILL) WOODS, MRS. KING, LT. COON, JODI STEVENS, LT. WILLIAMSON, MR. CHAMBERLAIN, THOMAS W. CORBETT, JR., ALL JOHN DOE'S AND JANE DOE'S, ALL ATTORNEY'S WORKING FOR ANY AND ALL CITY, COUNTY'S OR STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and ALL FEDERAL ATTORNEY'S WORKING FOR ANY AND ALL FEDERAL GOVERNMENT'S OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2008cv01706
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Amy Reynolds Hay
Presiding Judge: Amy Reynolds Hay
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER accepting and adopting the Magistrate Judge's Order of April 12, 2013. Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal 164 is dismissed and this case shall remain closed until Plaintiff retains counsel. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 7/17/2013. (sps)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting 149 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by JAY V. YUNIK. Defendants' Summary Judgment due by 4/12/2013. Plaintiff's Response to Summary Judgment due by 5/10/2013. Reply brief due by 5/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/12/2013. (jlh )
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 126 Motion seeking recusal of Magistrate Judge Caiazza. Signed by Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 3/29/2011. (bb)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 87 Plaintiff's "objections", construed as a motion for reconsideration.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/2/2010. (jlh )
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/16/2010. (jlh )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Amended Complaint is dismissed in part for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation, Dkt. 32 , filed on October 26, 2009 by C hief Magistrate Judge Hay, is adopted as the opinion of the court, as supplemented by this Memorandum Order. Hence, only the following claims remain: (1) Plaintiffs claims for violation of his equal protection rights (Doc. 12 at Paragraphs 50-65) and (2) Plaintiffs claims for retaliation (Doc. 12 at Paragraphs 27-43 and 66-70). Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/17/09. (jlh)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that pursuant to the screening provisions of the PLRA, the complaint be dismissed in part. Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2009. Signed by Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Amy Reynolds Hay on 10/26/2009. (dgg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YUNIK v. MCVEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY V. YUNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE C. MCVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY R. IMBODEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. MANGINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN A. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD N. MASSARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL M. WEBSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD A. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL JOHN DOE'S AND JANES DOE'S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY A. BEARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH VIGLIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL W. HARLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED J. RUFFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. MAHLEMISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM (BILL) WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS. KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. COON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODI STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. CHAMBERLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS W. CORBETT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL JOHN DOE'S AND JANE DOE'S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ATTORNEY'S WORKING FOR ANY AND ALL CITY, COUNTY'S OR STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL FEDERAL ATTORNEY'S WORKING FOR ANY AND ALL FEDERAL GOVERNMENT'S OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?