SKINNER ENGINE COMPANY et al v. ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISK U.S. INSURANCE CO. et al
Appellant: SKINNER ENGINE COMPANY and AMERICAN CAPITAL EQUIPMENT, LLC
Appellee: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISK U.S. INSURANCE CO., CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY, PACIFIC EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY, CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THE FAIRCHILD CORPORATION, GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, FIRST STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY CO., FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY OF OHIO and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Claimant: LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR FUTURE ASBESTOS CLAIMANTS and MARITIME ASBESTOS CLAIMANTS
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and INTERIM CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
Case Number: 2:2009cv00886
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Appendix to 63 Appellee's Brief of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 12/16/09. (map)
July 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Consolidate instant case and Civil Action No. 09-887; All subsequent pleadings shall be filed at Civil Action No. 09-886 only and the Clerk shall mark Case No. 09-cv-887 closed; Appellants shall file and serve the opening brief by 9/10/2009; Appellees shall file and serve responsive briefs by 11/10/2009; Appellants shall file and serve replies by 12/10/2009. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 7/24/09. (map)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROCEDURAL ORDER re 1 Bankruptcy Appeal: Appellants' Brief due by 8/7/2009; Appellees' Brief due by 8/28/2009; Appellants' Reply Brief due by 9/11/2009. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 7/17/09. (map)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKINNER ENGINE COMPANY et al v. ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISK U.S. INSURANCE CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SKINNER ENGINE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert G. Sable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AMERICAN CAPITAL EQUIPMENT, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Sable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISK U.S. INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Lawrence A. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Mark D. Plevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PACIFIC EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark D. Plevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: David K. Rudov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David K. Rudov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE FAIRCHILD CORPORATION
Represented By: Zakarij O. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Joel M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Robert J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FIRST STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA
Represented By: Michael A. Shiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By: John M. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY CO.
Represented By: Amy E. Vulpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY OF OHIO
Represented By: Mark D. Plevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert B. Millner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR FUTURE ASBESTOS CLAIMANTS
Represented By: Robert S. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MARITIME ASBESTOS CLAIMANTS
Represented By: Erik Sobkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: Joseph M. Fornari, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: INTERIM CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Sikirica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?