PEERMUSIC, III, LTD. et al v. MOTIVE FORCE LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD., SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC and HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC
Defendant: MOTIVE FORCE LLC and SEAN COLUMBO
Case Number: 2:2009cv01137
Filed: August 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Mitchell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2010 Remark: Remark forwarded judgment letter with copy of 19 judgment order attached via email to Copyright Office. (ksa)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Consent Judgment; Defendants and their principals, officers, directors, partners, employees, agents, servants, representatives, sub-tenants, affiliates, subsidiaries, parent and related companies, successors in interest and all persons or entities in active concert or participation with Defendants are permanently enjoined from the date of this Order onward from infringing, whether directly or indirectly, and from causing, enabling, facilitating, encouraging, inducing, promoting, contributing to, assisting, and/or participating in the unlicensed reproduction, public distribution, public display or other infringement of any musical composition protected by copyright, including, without limitation, the copyrights in Plaintiffs' Songs; Without limitation of the foregoing, Defendants and their principals, officers, directors, partners, employees, agents, servants, representatives, sub-tenants, affiliates, subsidiaries, parent and related companies, successors in interest and all persons or entities in active concert or participation with Defendants are permanently enjoined from, directly or indirectly, operating, authorizing the operation of, or assisting in the operation of the unlicensed LyricWiki Website or any other unlicensed website, or creating or assisting in the creation of any software application, database or service that reproduces, publicly distributes or publicly displays unlicensed lyrics from any musical composition protected by copyright, including without limitation Plaintiffs' Songs; Judgment in the amount of $150,000.00 is entered in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants, which sum shall be paid by Defendants to Plaintiffs in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement; Defendants shall promptly remit to Plaintiffs any monies that come under Defendants' control in connection with the exploitation of any software application or any application programming interface ("API") by which Defendants assisted and/or induced third-party software developers or users to display or distribute copies of unlicensed lyrics from Plaintiffs' Songs to consumers' computers or personal media players, which sum(s) shall be paid by Defendants to Plaintiffs in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement; The Court shall retain jurisdiction of this Action until such time as the settlement payment contained in this Consent Judgment and the Settlement Agreement has been satisfied and for the purpose of enforcing all of the provisions of the same. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 1/4/10. (map) Modified on 1/5/2010 to correct typos. (ksa)
December 23, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION for Judgment by Consent by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD.. Motion(s) referred to Robert C. Mitchell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (White, David)
December 10, 2009 Judge Gary L. Lancaster and Robert C. Mitchell added. (jls)
December 10, 2009 Judge Robert C. Mitchell no longer presiding. (jls)
December 10, 2009 Filing 17 DISTRICT JUDGE OPTION by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD. to have this case randomly assigned to a U.S. District Judge. (White, David)
December 10, 2009 Filing 16 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO. (Salvatore, Corrado)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 12/11/2009. Signed by Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 12/8/2009. (spc)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, MOTIVE FORCE LLC answer due 12/4/2009; SEAN COLUMBO answer due 12/4/2009. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 11/19/2009. (spc)
November 18, 2009 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, filed by WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, PEERMUSIC LTD., HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PSO LTD., BUG MUSIC, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., WB MUSIC CORP., SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP. by MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Salvatore, Corrado)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. MOTIVE FORCE LLC answer due 11/20/2009; SEAN COLUMBO answer due 11/20/2009. Signed by Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 10/21/2009. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
October 21, 2009 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa)
October 20, 2009 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to 1 Complaint by MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Salvatore, Corrado) Modified on 10/21/2009 document linkage corrected. Document linked to document 1 . (ksa)
September 16, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Corrado Salvatore on behalf of MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO. (Salvatore, Corrado)
September 15, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen L. Jankowski on behalf of MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO. (Jankowski, Gretchen)
September 15, 2009 Filing 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO Answer due from MOTIVE FORCE LLC on 10/21/2009; SEAN COLUMBO on 10/21/2009. (Salvatore, Corrado)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 8 Motion for Kandis M. Koustenis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 9/14/2009. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 7 Motion for Ross J. Charap to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 9/14/2009. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
September 11, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Kandis M. Koustenis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 03150000000001365962) by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kandis M. Koustenis, # 2 Proposed Order) (White, David)
September 11, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Ross J. Charap to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 03150000000001365934) by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ross J. Charap, # 2 Proposed Order) (White, David)
September 3, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD. MOTIVE FORCE LLC served on 8/30/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (White, David)
September 3, 2009 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD. SEAN COLUMBO served on 8/30/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (White, David)
August 25, 2009 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying Warner Music Group Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD.. (White, David)
August 24, 2009 Filing 3 COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (jsp, )
August 24, 2009 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (jsp) Modified on 8/25/2009. (jsp, )Error: Document did not attach. See Document 3
August 24, 2009 Summons Issued as to *MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO* (jsp)
August 24, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOTIVE FORCE LLC, SEAN COLUMBO (Filing fee $350, receipt number 1344434), filed by SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC., WB MUSIC CORP., WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., BUG MUSIC, INC., PEERMUSIC, III, LTD., WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC, HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC, SONGS OF PEER, LTD., PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP., PEERMUSIC LTD., PSO LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Summons Motive Force, # 6 Summons Sean Columbo) (jsp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEERMUSIC, III, LTD. et al v. MOTIVE FORCE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEERMUSIC, III, LTD.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONGS OF PEER, LTD.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEER INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEERMUSIC LTD.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSO LTD.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., INC.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB MUSIC CORP.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARNER-TAMERLANE PUBLISHING CORP.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUG MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINDSWEPT HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HITCO MUSIC PUBLISHING, LLC
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTIVE FORCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN COLUMBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?