CODEPINK PITTSBURGH WOMEN FOR PEACE et al v. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Plaintiff: CODEPINK PITTSBURGH WOMEN FOR PEACE, 3 RIVERS CLIMATE CONVERGENCE, THOMAS MERTON CENTER, PITTSBURGH OUTDOOR ARTISTS, BAIL OUT THE PEOPLE and G6 BILLION JOURNEY AND WITNESS
Defendant: UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CITY OF PITTSBURGH and PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION AND NATURAL RESOURCES
Intervenor: UNITED STEELWORKERS OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2009cv01235
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Motion is GRANTED WITH MODIFICATION as to defendant City of Pittsburgh and DENIED as to all other defendants; Plaintiffs may recover costs in the amount of $1,844.57 and attorneys' fees in the amount of$94,398.00 from defendant City of Pittsburgh. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 6/1/10. (map)
November 3, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Action Voluntarily and Set a Schedule for Resolving Attorneys' Fees; Action is dismissed under Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(2); Deadlines set forth in the Court's order of 10/12/2009 are cancelled; Parti es directed to discuss plaintiffs' claim for attorney fees and costs in an attempt to settle the dispute; If not settled by 12/3/2009, plaintiffs shall file a petition for fees and costs no later than 12/15/2009; This Court retains jurisdiction over this matter for the sole purpose of resolving the issue of costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 11/3/09. (map)
September 17, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 6 Motion to Intervene; Moreover, motion fails to comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(c). Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 9/17/09. (map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CODEPINK PITTSBURGH WOMEN FOR PEACE et al v. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CODEPINK PITTSBURGH WOMEN FOR PEACE
Represented By: Witold J. Walczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3 RIVERS CLIMATE CONVERGENCE
Represented By: Witold J. Walczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MERTON CENTER
Represented By: Witold J. Walczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PITTSBURGH OUTDOOR ARTISTS
Represented By: Witold J. Walczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAIL OUT THE PEOPLE
Represented By: Witold J. Walczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G6 BILLION JOURNEY AND WITNESS
Represented By: Witold J. Walczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION AND NATURAL RESOURCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNITED STEELWORKERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel M. Kovalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?