ROYAL MILE COMPANY, INC. et al v. UPMC et al
Plaintiff: ROYAL MILE COMPANY, INC., ROYAL MILE ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC and PAMELA LANG
Defendant: UPMC and HIGHMARK, INC.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01609
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Schwab
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER granting 734 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; Plaintiff may file unredacted versions of Exhibits B, C and D of the Affidavit of Samantha Ries, Senior Project Manager of Rust Consulting with the Clerk of Courts; Plaintiff shall f ile a redacted version of Exhibits B, C and D of the Affidavit of Samantha Ries, Senior Project Manager of Rust Consulting on the docket in the above-captioned action. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/22/2021. (map)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER denying objections 699 ; granting in part, denying in part objections 698 and 700 ; and adopting in part, rejecting in part the R&R No. 6, which is consolidated at 692 for the reasons set forth in the order and on the record on 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/21/2020. (kjm)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 630 OPINION setting forth the reasons the motion to certify class 525 will be DENIED AS PREMATURE. Appropriate orders will be entered. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/1/2019. (kjm)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 493 OPINION setting forth the reasons the motion for summary judgment 455 filed by Highmark, Inc. will be DENIED. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/15/2017. (kjm)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 441 Partial MOTION for Reconsideration re 432 Memorandum Opinion & Order, 433 Order, MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CLARIFICATION OF THIS COURTS SEPTEMBER 20, 2016 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER MOTION for Clarification filed by COLE'S WEXFORD HOTEL, INC.. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/1/17. (jp)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 OPINION setting forth the reasons the amended report and recommendation no. 4 403 will be adopted in part and rejected in part. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/20/16. (kjm)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 OPINION setting forth the reasons the SPECIAL MASTER REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION No. 2 165 will be adopted in full. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/8/16. (kjm) Modified on 2/8/2016 to include "setting forth the reasons...will be adopted in full." (kjm)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 OPINION setting forth the reasons Highmark's motion to dismiss 288 will be DENIED and UPMC's motion to dismiss 290 will be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/1/15. (kjm)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 OPINION setting forth the reasons plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a third amended complaint will be GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/21/14. (kjm)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MEMORANDUM OPINION adopting Report and Recommendation No. 3, as supplemented by this opinion, as the opinion of the court. Motion for leave to file under seal 166 will be granted in part, denied in part. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/6/14. (kjm)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 OPINION re: the motions to dismiss the second amended complaint ( 95 and 188 ). An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/27/13. (kjm)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER No. 2: The attached order is hereby adopted as an order of this court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/24/13. (kjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROYAL MILE COMPANY, INC. et al v. UPMC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROYAL MILE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Matthew T. Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROYAL MILE ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA LANG
Represented By: Matthew T. Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHMARK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?